Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1906 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1906
 (In the Senate - Filed April 14, 2011; April 18, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Select Committee on Open Government;
 April 29, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 29, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1906 By:  Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain notice requirements for municipalities and
 counties under the open meetings law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.0415, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.0415.  GOVERNING BODY OF MUNICIPALITY OR
 COUNTY:  REPORTS ABOUT ITEMS OF COMMUNITY INTEREST REGARDING WHICH
 NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN. (a)  Notwithstanding Sections 551.041 and
 551.042, a quorum of the governing body of a municipality or county
 may receive from [municipal] staff of the political subdivision and
 a member of the governing body may make a report about items of
 community interest during a meeting of the governing body without
 having given notice of the subject of the report as required by this
 subchapter if no action is taken and, except as provided by Section
 551.042, possible action is not discussed regarding the information
 provided in the report.
 (b)  For purposes of Subsection (a), "items of community
 interest" includes:
 (1)  expressions of thanks, congratulations, or
 condolence;
 (2)  information regarding holiday schedules;
 (3)  an honorary or salutary recognition of a public
 official, public employee, or other citizen, except that a
 discussion regarding a change in the status of a person's public
 office or public employment is not an honorary or salutary
 recognition for purposes of this subdivision;
 (4)  a reminder about an upcoming event organized or
 sponsored by the governing body;
 (5)  information regarding a social, ceremonial, or
 community event organized or sponsored by an entity other than the
 governing body that was attended or is scheduled to be attended by a
 member of the governing body or an official or employee of the
 political subdivision [municipality]; and
 (6)  announcements involving an imminent threat to the
 public health and safety of people in the political subdivision
 [municipality] that has arisen after the posting of the agenda.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.050, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.050.  MUNICIPAL GOVERNMENTAL BODY:  PLACE OF
 POSTING NOTICE. (a)  In this section, "electronic bulletin board"
 means an electronic communication system that includes a
 perpetually illuminated screen on which the governmental body can
 post messages or notices viewable without manipulation by the
 public.
 (b)  A municipal governmental body shall post notice of each
 meeting on a physical or electronic bulletin board at a place
 convenient to the public in the city hall.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *