House | 05/25/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 5759 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4033 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3548 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2552 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2141 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2141 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 2141 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |