Senate | 05/24/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 11/09/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/09/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |