E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 1/1/12
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3490
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3339
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1338
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4993
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2970
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4695
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4695
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2949
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#725
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2948
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Callegari
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 469
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1660
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 987
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 222
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 222
|
Senate
|
11/10/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|