House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 967 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 223 | |
Senate | 11/17/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/17/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |