Senate | 05/23/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Referred to s/c on Public Education Funding by Chair | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 521 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 521 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |