Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB226 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 226
 (In the Senate - Filed November 18, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 4, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 226 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reporting individual student performance on a physical
 fitness assessment instrument to the Texas Education Agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 38.103, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.103.  REPORTING OF PHYSICAL FITNESS [SUMMARY]
 RESULTS.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 38.103, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A school district shall provide [compile] the results of
 individual student performance on the physical fitness assessment
 required by this subchapter [and provide summary results,
 aggregated by grade level and any other appropriate category
 identified by commission rule,] to the agency.  The [summary]
 results may not contain the names of individual students or
 teachers or a student's social security number or date of birth.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *