House
|
05/29/2011
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 6660
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4685
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3495
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5287
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3218
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2688
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4370
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1186
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4369
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4300
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1173
|
Journal Page: 4299
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4299
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4299
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
49-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4298
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
47-Landtroop
|
Journal Page: 4297
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
48-Landtroop
|
Journal Page: 4297
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
47-Landtroop
|
Journal Page: 4296
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4296
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
44-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 4289
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
38-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 4284
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 4270
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
24-Perry
|
Journal Page: 4266
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
13-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4252
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1110
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 1417
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1417
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1416
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1416
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
No action taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to s/c on Medicaid by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|