E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3286
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB425
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4125
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2256
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 225
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 225
|
Senate
|
11/19/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|