House | 05/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3652 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1224 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 11/23/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/23/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |