E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5150 | |
E | 05/24/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5036 | |
Senate | 05/23/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3320 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2799 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#1185 | Journal Page: 4365 |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4365 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4365 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/20/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 827 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 826 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 12/06/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/06/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |