E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4537
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6237
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1624
|
Journal Page: 6237
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6237
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4018
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5854
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4840
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1290
|
Journal Page: 4839
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4839
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Harless
|
Journal Page: 4839
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4839
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 226
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 226
|
Senate
|
12/07/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|