E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2634
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4211
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3091
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 964
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 935
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
02/23/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|