E | 05/27/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/27/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
E | 05/16/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4060 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2327 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2309 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2252 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3671 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#988 | Journal Page: 3671 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3671 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3671 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3608 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 323 | Journal Page: 3608 |
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 229 | |
Senate | 12/20/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/20/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |