|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5258
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1383
|
Journal Page: 5258
|
|
05/24/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#504
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#496
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-Coleman
|
Journal Page: 2068
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 10
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 484
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 205
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|