Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3574
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5408
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5408
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 525
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 229
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 229
|
Senate
|
12/21/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|