Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB286 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris S.B. No. 286
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2010; March 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 14, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to attorney's fees and other amounts taxed as costs in
 guardianship proceedings.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 665A, Texas Probate Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 665A.  PAYMENT FOR PROFESSIONAL SERVICES.  The court
 shall order the payment of a fee in an amount set by the court that
 is fair and just as compensation to the attorneys, mental health
 professionals, and interpreters appointed under this chapter, as
 applicable, to be taxed as costs in the case.  The court may
 allocate attorney's fees taxed as costs under this section among
 the parties as the court finds is fair and just.  If after examining
 the proposed ward's assets the court determines the proposed ward
 is unable to pay for costs allocated to the proposed ward for
 services provided by an attorney, a mental health professional, or
 an interpreter appointed under this chapter, as applicable, the
 county is responsible for those costs [the cost of those services].
 SECTION 2.  Section 665B, Texas Probate Code, as amended by
 Chapters 314 (H.B. 587) and 930 (H.B. 3080), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 665B.  PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES TO CERTAIN ATTORNEYS.
 (a)  A court that creates a guardianship or creates a management
 trust under Section 867 of this code for a ward under this chapter,
 on request of a person who filed an application to be appointed
 guardian of the proposed ward, an application for the appointment
 of another suitable person as guardian of the proposed ward, or an
 application for the creation of the management trust, may authorize
 the payment of reasonable and necessary attorney's fees, as
 determined by the court, in amounts the court considers fair and
 just, to an attorney who represents the person who filed the
 application at the application hearing, regardless of whether the
 person is appointed the ward's guardian or whether a management
 trust is created, from:
 (1)  subject to Subsection (a-1) of this section, the
 parties to the guardianship proceeding, allocated as the court
 finds is fair and just; or
 (2)  subject to Subsection (a-1) of this section,
 available funds of the [ward's estate or] management trust, if
 created.
 (a-1)  The court may authorize amounts allocated to the
 ward's estate under Subsection (a)(1) of this section or amounts to
 be paid from available funds of the management trust as provided by
 Subsection (a)(2) of this section to instead be paid from the county
 treasury,[; or
 [(2)]  subject to Subsection (c) of this section, [the
 county treasury] if:
 (1) [(A)]  the ward's estate or[, if created,]
 management trust[,] is insufficient to pay [for] the amounts
 [services provided by the attorney]; and
 (2) [(B)]  funds in the county treasury are budgeted
 for that purpose.
 (b)  The court may not authorize attorney's fees under this
 section unless the court finds that the applicant acted in good
 faith and for just cause in the filing and prosecution of the
 application.
 (c)  The court may authorize the payment of attorney's fees
 from the county treasury under Subsection (a-1) [(a)] of this
 section only if the court is satisfied that the attorney to whom the
 fees will be paid has not received, and is not seeking, payment for
 the services described by that subsection from any other source.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 669, Texas Probate Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this section or
 Section 665A or 665B(a) of this code, in a guardianship matter, the
 cost of the proceeding, including the cost of the guardian ad litem
 or court visitor, shall be set in an amount the court considers fair
 and just and shall be paid out of the guardianship estate, or, if
 the estate is insufficient to pay for the cost of the proceeding,
 the cost of the proceeding shall be paid out of the county treasury,
 and the judgment of the court shall be issued accordingly.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 guardianship created before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *