E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4539
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4032
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1551
|
Journal Page: 5941
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5941
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2482
|
Journal Page: 5940
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3996
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1779
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1774
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#466
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2033
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2032
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-D. Miller
|
Journal Page: 1987
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-D. Miller and Ritter
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2112
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 735
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 649
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
01/04/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|