E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6597
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1702
|
Journal Page: 6596
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6596
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6279
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4092
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate recommits to conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4091
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House recommits to conf. comm.-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 5841
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5841
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House recommits to conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5840
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5840
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1528
|
Journal Page: 5840
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept.
|
|
Journal Page: 5840
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5398
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3317
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4329
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4329
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1029
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3762
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 3761
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3761
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3670
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3669
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3669
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3669
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3668
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3668
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3604
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 3602
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3601
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 4:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2856
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3177
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 504
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
01/05/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|