E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1177
|
Journal Page: 4342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3997
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1542
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5894
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2406
|
Journal Page: 5892
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4124
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2502
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2501
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2499
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#666
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2813
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2812
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2812
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hartnett
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2734
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
9-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 2733
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2733
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#653
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
8-Castro
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Kleinschmidt
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 681
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 587
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 534
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 504
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
02/07/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 278
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
01/24/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 62
|
Senate
|
01/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|