E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2472 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 3964 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3964 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3964 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3729 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3729 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 597 | Journal Page: 3729 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3526 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2718 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 822 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 830 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 02/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 310 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 310 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 48 | |
Senate | 01/12/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |