|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1359
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5078
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 5019
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5018
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 11:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 5012
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 5011
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Ritter
|
Journal Page: 5011
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5011
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 825
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|