E
|
04/29/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
04/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1604
|
E
|
04/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1281
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1237
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2005
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1051
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#344
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 310
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|