House
|
05/23/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 4335
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 4335
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3295
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3295
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1785
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1046
|
Senate
|
03/21/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|