House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4185
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1487
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1487
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1487
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 206
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|