Senate | 05/20/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2687 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order fails | Journal Page: 2687 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2374 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 01/13/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |