Senate | 05/23/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 01/14/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |