E | 05/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
E | 05/05/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1921 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3087 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1902 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/04/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1745 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Record vote | RV#667 | Journal Page: 2814 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 865 | Journal Page: 2738 |
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1686 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 515 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |