House | 04/05/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1502 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1502 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 643 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |