E | 04/21/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/21/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1344 | |
E | 04/12/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | RV#294 | Journal Page: 1583 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1564 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1564 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB1493 | Journal Page: 1564 |
House | 04/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1108 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 729 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 536 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |