House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4338 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3525 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2160 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 974 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 331 | |
Senate | 02/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |