House | 05/11/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3652 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2257 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2165 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1048 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Open Government, Select | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |