E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6366
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6366
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1646
|
Journal Page: 6365
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6365
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6456
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4542
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5958
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5958
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5958
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3776
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3775
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3775
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3775
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3775
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4856
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4856
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1305
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4855
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4760
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4759
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1261
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Motion to table fails
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4758
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/21/11 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4727
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1223
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 866
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 822
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 820
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 820
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 820
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
01/19/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|