Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB377 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 377


 AN ACT
 relating to the murder of a child as a capital offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 19.03, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if the person commits murder
 as defined under Section 19.02(b)(1) and:
 (1)  the person murders a peace officer or fireman who
 is acting in the lawful discharge of an official duty and who the
 person knows is a peace officer or fireman;
 (2)  the person intentionally commits the murder in the
 course of committing or attempting to commit kidnapping, burglary,
 robbery, aggravated sexual assault, arson, obstruction or
 retaliation, or terroristic threat under Section 22.07(a)(1), (3),
 (4), (5), or (6);
 (3)  the person commits the murder for remuneration or
 the promise of remuneration or employs another to commit the murder
 for remuneration or the promise of remuneration;
 (4)  the person commits the murder while escaping or
 attempting to escape from a penal institution;
 (5)  the person, while incarcerated in a penal
 institution, murders another:
 (A)  who is employed in the operation of the penal
 institution; or
 (B)  with the intent to establish, maintain, or
 participate in a combination or in the profits of a combination;
 (6)  the person:
 (A)  while incarcerated for an offense under this
 section or Section 19.02, murders another; or
 (B)  while serving a sentence of life imprisonment
 or a term of 99 years for an offense under Section 20.04, 22.021, or
 29.03, murders another;
 (7)  the person murders more than one person:
 (A)  during the same criminal transaction; or
 (B)  during different criminal transactions but
 the murders are committed pursuant to the same scheme or course of
 conduct;
 (8)  the person murders an individual under 10 [six]
 years of age; or
 (9)  the person murders another person in retaliation
 for or on account of the service or status of the other person as a
 judge or justice of the supreme court, the court of criminal
 appeals, a court of appeals, a district court, a criminal district
 court, a constitutional county court, a statutory county court, a
 justice court, or a municipal court.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 377 passed the Senate on
 March 30, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2, one
 present not voting; May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House
 amendment and requested appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 27, 2011, House granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011,
 Senate adopted Conference Committee Report by the following
 vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 377 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 141,
 Nays 1, two present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 14, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor