E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6278
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3701
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5448
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1428
|
Journal Page: 5448
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5448
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5448
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5272
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 5271
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5270
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1864
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1110
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1109
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1107
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|