E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5053
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4532
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6270
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6270
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6282
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6282
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6282
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4141
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4141
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4141
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 4141
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3967
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2981
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4365
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1185
|
Journal Page: 4365
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4365
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4365
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 587
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
02/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 265
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|