House | 05/23/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5399 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1070 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 538 | |
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 01/25/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |