E | 05/28/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4181 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2515 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2553 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2485 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4070 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Record vote | RV#1130 | Journal Page: 4070 |
House | 05/17/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4070 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4070 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3976 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Record vote | RV#1105 | Journal Page: 3976 |
House | 05/16/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3976 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3974 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3974 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/13/11 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3813 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3813 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 655 | Journal Page: 3813 |
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1572 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 968 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 805 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |