E | 05/09/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/09/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2195 | |
E | 04/28/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1428 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2322 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | RV#503 | Journal Page: 2149 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2654 | Journal Page: 2140 |
House | 04/15/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1866 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1481 | |
House | 03/24/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 731 | |
Senate | 03/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 01/28/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |