House
|
05/22/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 207
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|