E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4526 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6276 | |
05/26/2011 | Signed in the House | |||
Senate | 05/26/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4010 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4034 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 3701 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5456 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5456 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | RV#1434 | Journal Page: 5455 |
House | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 5455 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 5455 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 5295 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 5289 |
House | 05/24/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 5289 | |
House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1573 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 969 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/01/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 462 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 311 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |