E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6280
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4254
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4251
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4802
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4804
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4770
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4776
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4776
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1791
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 940
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 724
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|