Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB47 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 47
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; April 11, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 11, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 47 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the pro re nata administration of psychoactive
 medications in certain residential health care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 576, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 576.0245 to read as follows:
 Sec. 576.0245.  ADMINISTRATION OF PSYCHOACTIVE MEDICATIONS.
 (a)  In this section, "facility" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 322.001.
 (b)  For each health and human services agency that regulates
 the care or treatment of a resident at a facility, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 adopt rules to govern the pro re nata administration of
 psychoactive medications to facility residents.
 (c)  The rules must:
 (1)  prohibit a health care practitioner authorized
 under the laws of this state to issue a prescription drug order from
 prescribing to a facility resident a standing psychoactive
 medication order to be administered pro re nata by injection;
 (2)  allow for the use of a psychoactive medication to
 be administered by injection:
 (A)  in a psychiatric emergency;
 (B)  under a court order; or
 (C)  on a per request basis by a facility
 resident, subject to Subsection (e);
 (3)  require a practitioner who administers
 psychoactive medication in a psychiatric emergency to document in
 the resident's clinical record the administration using specific
 medical and behavioral terms;
 (4)  require a nurse licensed in this state and
 employed by a facility to attend, before administering psychoactive
 medication by injection in a psychiatric emergency, training on the
 criteria that must be met to administer pro re nata psychoactive
 medication in a psychiatric emergency; and
 (5)  require a person employed by a facility to attend
 training on a resident's consent to treatment and refusal of
 consent to treatment that includes:
 (A)  information to instruct staff on
 identification of behaviors signifying a resident's refusal to
 consent to administration of medication; and
 (B)  information on effective intermediate
 measures to calm residents in distress by the use of methods other
 than control and intervention.
 (d)  A nurse licensed in this state and employed by a
 facility may not in a psychiatric emergency administer psychoactive
 medication by injection unless the nurse has attended the training
 required under Subsection (c)(4).
 (e)  Before a psychoactive medication is administered by
 injection on request by a facility resident, the facility must
 first obtain from the resident a signed consent for the specific
 administration of the medication by injection. A health care
 practitioner authorized under the laws of this state to issue the
 prescription drug order may issue a prescription drug order that
 authorizes psychoactive medication to be administered by injection
 on request of a facility resident only if the order is limited to a
 single administration of the medication at the resident's request.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2012, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt the rules required by Section 576.0245, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  A health care practitioner subject to Section 576.0245,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, is not required to
 comply with that section until January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *