E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5149
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5083
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6598
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1703
|
Journal Page: 6597
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6597
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6871
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5051
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5969
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5962
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3994
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3992
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3701
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5466
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1442
|
Journal Page: 5465
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5465
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Bohac
|
Journal Page: 5464
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5463
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5370
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1396
|
Journal Page: 5369
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5369
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5369
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3652
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 643
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 596
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|