House | 05/20/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4617 | |
House | 05/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2383 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1223 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 823 |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 823 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 830 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 735 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |