E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5762
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3334
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1284
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
1-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4729
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
1-S. Miller
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3300
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1224
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 834
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 617
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 312
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|