House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 883 |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 881 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 851 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 851 | |
Senate | 03/30/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 438 | |
Senate | 02/15/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 331 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 314 | |
Senate | 02/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 314 | |
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |