House
|
05/24/2011
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5089
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 5089
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5089
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/24/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5004
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/23/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4345
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
02/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|