E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5150
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4041
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2616
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1175
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
4-Brown
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4312
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4231
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/19/11 7:59 AM
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4140
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4130
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Amended
|
7-Hughes
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/17/11 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/13/11 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 3517
|
Journal Page: 3710
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3829
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3649
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3525
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA17 Watson
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Resumed consideration
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Consideration withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA8 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA15 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA8 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 1689
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Motion for the previous question
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/28/11 11:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA7 Wentworth
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 521
|
Senate
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 521
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|