E
|
05/21/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/21/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 2977
|
E
|
05/10/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3520
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2192
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1768
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#711
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 2815
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2815
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 945
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1026
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 990
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
Senate
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|